Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Popes

by Papal Name


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
#Papal
Name
Birth
Date
Conclave
Start
ElectedInstalledEnd of ReignLength
DateAgeDateAgeDateAgeElectedInstalled
68Adeodatus I
77Adeodatus II
57Agapitus I
129Agapitus II
79Agatho
6Alexander I
156Alexander IIunknown30 Sep 1061N/A1 Oct 1061N/A21 Apr 1073N/A11.611.6
170Alexander III 11007 Sep 115959.720 Sep 1159*59.730 Aug 118181.722.021.9
181Alexander IV 118512 Dec 125469.920 Dec 125470.025 May 126176.46.56.4
214Alexander VI 14316 Aug 149211 Aug 149261.626 Aug 149261.718 Aug 150372.611.011.0
237Alexander VII13 Feb 159918 Jan 16557 Apr 165556.218 Apr 165556.222 May 166768.312.112.1
241Alexander VIII22 Apr 161023 Aug 16896 Oct 168979.516 Oct 168979.51 Feb 169180.81.31.3
39Anastasius I
50Anastasius II
120Anastasius III
168Anastasius IV 10738 Jul 115380.512 Jul 115380.53 Dec 115481.91.41.4
11Anicletus I
19Anterus
62Benedict I
81Benedict II
104Benedict III
117Benedict IV
132Benedict V
134Benedict VI
135Benedict VII
143Benedict VIII
145Benedict IX
147Benedict IX
150Benedict IX
194Benedict XI 124022 Oct 130363.827 Oct 130363.87 Jul 130464.5.7.7
197Benedict XII 128020 Dec 133455.08 Jan 133555.025 Apr 134262.37.37.3
245Benedict XIII2 Feb 164920 Mar 172429 May 172475.34 Jun 172475.323 Feb 173081.15.75.7
247Benedict XIV31 Mar 167518 Feb 174017 Aug 174065.422 Aug 174065.43 May 175883.117.717.7
258Benedict XV21 Nov 185431 Aug 19143 Sep 191459.86 Sep 191459.822 Jan 192267.27.47.4
265Benedict XVI16 Apr 192718 Apr 200519 Apr 200578.024 Apr 200578.028 Feb 2013#85.97.97.8
42Boniface I
55Boniface II
66Boniface III
67Boniface IV
69Boniface V
112Boniface VI
193Boniface VIII 123024 Dec 129465.023 Jan 1295*65.111 Oct 130373.88.88.7
203Boniface IX 13502 Nov 138939.89 Nov 1389*39.91 Oct 140454.814.914.9
16Callistus
162Callistus IIunknown2 Feb 1119N/A9 Feb 1119N/A13 Dec 1124N/A5.95.8
209Callistus III31 Dec 13784 Apr 14558 Apr 145576.320 Apr 145576.36 Aug 145879.63.33.3
43Celestine I
165Celestine IIunknown26 Sep 1143N/A3 Oct 1143*N/A8 Mar 1144N/A.5.4
175Celestine III 110510 Apr 119186.314 Apr 1191*86.38 Jan 119893.06.76.7
179Celestine IVunknown25 Oct 1241N/AN/AN/A10 Nov 1241N/A.0N/A
192Celestine V 12157 Jul 129479.529 Aug 1294*79.713 Dec 1294#79.9.4.3
4Clement I
149Clement II
174Clement III 113019 Dec 118758.07 Jan 118858.027 Mar 119161.23.33.2
183Clement IV 11955 Feb 126570.122 Feb 126570.129 Nov 126873.93.83.8
195Clement V 12645 Jun 130541.414 Nov 1305*41.920 Apr 131450.38.98.4
198Clement VI 12907 May 134252.319 May 134252.46 Dec 135262.910.610.5
219Clement VII26 May 14781 Oct 152319 Nov 152345.526 Nov 152345.525 Sep 153456.310.810.8
231Clement VIII24 Feb 153610 Jan 159230 Jan 159255.99 Feb 159256.03 Mar 160569.013.113.1
238Clement IX28 Jan 16002 Jun 166720 Jun 166767.426 Jun 166767.49 Dec 166969.92.52.5
239Clement X12 Jul 159020 Dec 166929 Apr 167079.811 May 167079.822 Jul 167686.06.26.2
243Clement XI23 Jul 16499 Oct 170023 Nov 170051.38 Dec 170051.419 Mar 172171.720.320.3
246Clement XII7 Apr 16525 Mar 173012 Jul 173078.316 Jul 173078.36 Feb 174087.89.69.6
248Clement XIII7 Mar 169315 May 17586 Jul 175865.316 Jul 175865.42 Feb 176975.910.610.5
249Clement XIV31 Oct 170515 Feb 176919 May 176963.69 Jun 176963.622 Sep 177468.95.35.3
3Cletus
83Conon
88Constantine
21Cornelius
37Damasus I
151Damasus II
25Dionysius
78Donus
13Eleutherius
75Eugene I
99Eugene II
167Eugene III 108515 Feb 114560.118 Dec 1145*61.08 Jul 115368.58.47.6
207Eugene IV 13832 Mar 14313 Mar 143148.211 Mar 143148.223 Feb 144764.116.015.9
31Eusebius
27Eutychian
5Evaristus
20Fabian
26Felix I
48Felix III
54Felix IV
111Formosus
266Francis17 Dec 193612 Mar 201313 Mar 201376.219 Mar 201376.3( Age: )
28Gaius
49Gelasius I
161Gelasius II 106224 Jan 111856.110 Mar 1118*56.229 Jan 111957.11.0.9
64Gregory I
89Gregory II
90Gregory III
101Gregory IV
138Gregory V
148Gregory VI
157Gregory VII 102022 Apr 107353.329 Jun 1073*53.525 May 108565.412.111.9
173Gregory VIII 110521 Oct 118782.825 Oct 1187*82.817 Dec 118783.0.2.1
178Gregory IX 117019 Mar 122757.211 Apr 122757.322 Aug 124171.614.414.4
184Gregory X 12101 Sep 127161.727 Mar 1272*62.210 Jan 127666.04.43.8
201Gregory XI 132930 Dec 137042.03 Jan 1371*42.027 Mar 137849.27.27.2
205Gregory XII 132718 Nov 140630 Nov 140679.919 Dec 140680.04 Jul 1415#88.58.68.5
226Gregory XIII7 Jan 150212 May 157213 May 157270.325 May 157270.410 Apr 158583.312.912.9
229Gregory XIV11 Feb 15358 Oct 15905 Dec 159055.88 Dec 159055.816 Oct 159156.7.9.9
234Gregory XV9 Jan 15548 Feb 16219 Feb 162167.114 Feb 162167.18 Jul 162369.52.42.4
254Gregory XVI8 Sep 176514 Dec 18302 Feb 183165.46 Feb 1831*65.41 Jun 184680.715.315.3
95Hadrian I
106Hadrian II
109Hadrian III
169Hadrian IV 11004 Dec 115454.95 Dec 115454.91 Sep 115959.74.74.7
186Hadrian V 121011 Jul 127666.5N/AN/A18 Aug 127666.6.1N/A
218Hadrian VI2 Mar 145927 Dec 15219 Jan 152262.931 Aug 152263.514 Sep 152364.51.71.0
46Hilarus
70Honorius I
163Honorius IIunknown15 Dec 1124N/A21 Dec 1124N/A13 Feb 1130N/A5.25.1
177Honorius III 115018 Jul 121666.524 Jul 1216*66.618 Mar 122777.210.710.7
190Honorius IV 12102 Apr 128575.320 May 1285*75.43 Apr 128777.32.01.9
52Hormisdas
9Hyginus
40Innocent I
164Innocent IIunknown14 Feb 1130N/A23 Feb 1130*N/A24 Sep 1143N/A13.613.6
176Innocent III 11608 Jan 119838.022 Feb 1198*38.116 Jul 121656.518.518.4
180Innocent IV 119525 Jun 124348.528 Jun 1243*48.57 Dec 125459.911.511.4
185Innocent V 122421 Jan 127652.122 Feb 127652.122 Jun 127652.5.4.3
199Innocent VI 128218 Dec 135271.030 Dec 135271.012 Sep 136280.79.79.7
204Innocent VII 133610 Oct 140417 Oct 140468.811 Nov 140468.96 Nov 140670.82.12.0
213Innocent VIII 143226 Aug 148429 Aug 148452.712 Sep 148452.725 Jul 149260.67.97.9
230Innocent IX20 Jul 151927 Oct 159129 Oct 159172.33 Nov 159172.330 Dec 159172.4.2.2
236Innocent X6 May 15749 Aug 164415 Sep 164470.44 Oct 164470.47 Jan 165580.710.310.3
240Innocent XI19 May 16112 Aug 167621 Sep 167665.34 Oct 167665.412 Aug 168978.212.912.9
242Innocent XII13 Mar 161512 Feb 169112 Jul 169176.315 Jul 169176.327 Sep 170085.59.29.2
244Innocent XIII13 May 165531 Mar 17218 May 172166.018 May 172166.07 Mar 172468.82.82.8
53John I
56John II
61John III
72John IV
82John V
85John VI
86John VII
107John VIII
116John IX
122John X
125John XI
130John XII
133John XIII
136John XIV
137John XV
140John XVII
141John XVIII
144John XIX
187John XXI 12108 Sep 127666.720 Sep 127666.720 May 127767.4.7.7
196John XXII 12447 Aug 131672.65 Sep 131672.74 Dec 133490.918.318.2
261John XXIII25 Nov 188125 Oct 195828 Oct 195876.94 Nov 195876.93 Jun 196381.54.64.6
263John Paul I17 Oct 191225 Aug 197826 Aug 197865.93 Sep 197865.928 Sep 197865.9.1.1
264John Paul II18 May 192014 Oct 197816 Oct 197858.422 Oct 197858.42 Apr 200584.926.526.4
35Julius I
216Julius II5 Dec 144331 Oct 15031 Nov 150359.926 Nov 150360.021 Feb 151369.29.39.2
221Julius III10 Sep 148729 Nov 15497 Feb 155062.422 Feb 155062.423 Mar 155567.55.15.1
121Lando
45Leo I
80Leo II
96Leo III
103Leo IV
118Leo V
123Leo VI
126Leo VII
131Leo VIII
152Leo IX
217Leo X11 Dec 14754 Mar 151311 Mar 151337.319 Mar 151337.31 Dec 152146.08.78.7
232Leo XI2 Jun 153514 Mar 16051 Apr 160569.810 Apr 160569.927 Apr 160569.9.1.0
252Leo XII22 Aug 17602 Sep 182328 Sep 182363.15 Oct 182363.110 Feb 182968.55.45.3
256Leo XIII2 Mar 181018 Feb 187820 Feb 187868.03 Mar 187868.020 Jul 190393.425.425.4
36Liberius
2Linus
22Lucius I
166Lucius IIunknown9 Mar 1144N/A12 Mar 1144*N/A15 Feb 1145N/A.9.9
171Lucius III 11001 Sep 118181.76 Sep 118181.725 Nov 118585.94.24.2
29Marcellinus
30Marcellus I
222Marcellus II6 May 15015 Apr 15559 Apr 155553.910 Apr 1555*53.91 May 155554.0.1.1
108Marinus I
128Marinus II
34Mark
74Martin I
189Martin IV 121022 Feb 128171.123 Mar 1281*71.228 Mar 128575.24.14.0
206Martin V 13688 Nov 141711 Nov 141749.921 Nov 141749.920 Feb 143163.113.313.2
32Miltiades
105Nicholas I
155Nicholas II 9806 Dec 105878.924 Jan 105979.127 Jul 106181.62.62.5
188Nicholas III 121025 Nov 127767.9Dec 1277*67.922 Aug 128070.62.72.7
191Nicholas IV30 Sep 122722 Feb 128860.425 Feb 128860.44 Apr 129264.54.14.1
208Nicholas V15 Nov 13974 Mar 14476 Mar 144749.319 Mar 144749.324 Mar 145557.48.08.0
98Paschal I
160Paschal II 105013 Aug 109949.614 Aug 1099*49.621 Jan 111868.118.418.4
93Paul
211Paul II23 Feb 141727 Aug 146430 Aug 146447.516 Sep 146447.626 Jul 147154.46.96.9
220Paul III29 Feb 146811 Oct 153413 Oct 153466.63 Nov 153466.710 Nov 154981.715.115.0
223Paul IV28 Jun 147615 May 155523 May 155578.926 May 155578.918 Aug 155983.14.24.2
233Paul V17 Sep 15528 May 160516 May 160552.729 May 160552.728 Jan 162168.415.715.7
262Paul VI26 Sep 189719 Jun 196321 Jun 196365.730 Jun 196365.86 Aug 197880.915.115.1
60Pelagius I
63Pelagius II
1Peter
10Pius I
210Pius II18 Oct 140516 Aug 145819 Aug 145852.83 Sep 145852.914 Aug 146458.86.05.9
215Pius III29 May 143916 Sep 150322 Sep 150364.38 Oct 150364.418 Oct 150364.4.1.0
224Pius IV31 Mar 14995 Sep 155925 Dec 155960.76 Jan 156060.89 Dec 156566.76.05.9
225Pius V17 Jan 150420 Dec 15657 Jan 156662.017 Jan 156662.01 May 157268.36.36.3
250Pius VI25 Dec 17175 Oct 177415 Feb 177557.122 Feb 1775*57.229 Aug 179981.724.524.5
251Pius VII14 Aug 17421 Dec 179914 Mar 180057.621 Mar 180057.620 Aug 182381.023.423.4
253Pius VIII20 Nov 176124 Feb 182931 Mar 182967.45 Apr 182967.430 Nov 183069.01.71.7
255Pius IX13 May 179214 Jun 184616 Jun 184654.121 Jun 184654.17 Feb 187885.731.631.6
257Pius X2 Jun 183531 Jul 19034 Aug 190368.29 Aug 190368.220 Aug 191479.211.011.0
259Pius XI31 May 18572 Feb 19226 Feb 192264.712 Feb 192264.710 Feb 193981.717.017.0
260Pius XII2 Mar 18761 Mar 19392 Mar 193963.012 Mar 193963.09 Oct 195882.619.619.6
18Pontian
114Romanus
65Sabinian
84Sergius I
102Sergius II
119Sergius III
142Sergius IV
71Severinus
58Silverius
47Simplicius
38Siricius
87Sisinius
7Sixtus I
24Sixtus II
44Sixtus III
212Sixtus IV21 Jul 14146 Aug 14719 Aug 147157.125 Aug 1471*57.112 Aug 148470.113.013.0
227Sixtus V13 Dec 152121 Apr 158524 Apr 158563.41 May 158563.427 Aug 159068.75.35.3
12Soter
23Stephen I
92Stephen II
94Stephen III
97Stephen IV
110Stephen V
113Stephen VI
124Stephen VII
127Stephen VIII
154Stephen IX (X)
33Sylvester I
139Sylvester II
146Sylvester III
51Symmachus
8Telesphorus
73Theodore I
115Theodore II
17Urban I
159Urban II 103512 Mar 108853.212 Mar 108853.229 Jul 109964.611.411.4
172Urban III 112025 Nov 118565.91 Dec 118565.920 Oct 118767.81.91.9
182Urban IV 119529 Aug 126166.7N/AN/A2 Oct 126469.83.1N/A
200Urban V 131028 Sep 136252.76 Nov 1362*52.819 Dec 137061.08.28.1
202Urban VI 13188 Apr 137860.318 Apr 137860.315 Oct 138971.811.511.5
228Urban VII4 Aug 15217 Sep 159015 Sep 159069.1N/AN/A27 Sep 159069.1.0N/A
235Urban VIII5 Apr 156819 Jul 16236 Aug 162355.329 Sep 162355.529 Jul 164476.321.020.8
100Valentine
14Victor I
153Victor II
158Victor III 102624 May 108660.49 May 1087*61.416 Sep 108761.71.3.4
59Vigilius
76Vitalian
91Zacharias
15Zephyrinus
41Zosimus
Note: The above table is substantially incomplete at this time.
* indicates the Pope was not already a bishop at the time of his election, so the date is of his consecration.
# indicates the Pope resigned.
Popes listed: 266. This table was last updated on 17 Nov 2014.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014