Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Eugene II

Eugenio

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
780¹Born
816¹36.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
816¹36.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 May 82444.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Jun 82444.4Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Aug 82747.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Eugenio (VIAF: 19210627)
Pope Eugenio (born 780, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast