Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Lucius II

Gerardo Caccianemici Dell’Orso

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Can. Reg. of S. Maria di Reno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1095¹Born
Dec 1122³27.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
Dec 1122³27.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Mar 114449.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Mar 114449.1Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
15 Feb 114550.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Caccianemici Dell’Orso
Pope Gerardo Caccianemici Dell’Orso (born 1095, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a bishop for .9 years
  • a cardinal for 21.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Dec 1122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast