Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent II

Gregorio Papareschi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1082¹Born
1088¹6.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon
1088¹6.0Elevated to Cardinal
1116²34.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 Feb 113048.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Feb 113048.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 113048.1Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Sep 114361.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Papareschi
Pope Gregorio Papareschi (born 1082, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 13.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
  • a cardinal for 42.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 20 Mar 2018