Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Egilbert

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1065Born
1129²63.6AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
1130²64.6ResignedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
20 Oct 113974.4AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
29 May 114681.0DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Egilbert (VIAF: 80339795)
Patriarch Egilbert (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePassau

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,747
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast