Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement V

Bertrand de Got

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1264²Born
28 Mar 129531.2AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
23 Dec 129935.9AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
5 Jun 130541.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Nov 130541.8Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Apr 131450.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Got (VIAF: 84532574)
Pope Bertrand de Got (born 1264, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillandraut, France
Death PlaceRoquemaure

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
  • a pope for 8.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 150, and Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 1 Jan 2020

Quantcast