Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Weichardo de Pollheim

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1312Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
27 Aug 1312AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
6 Oct 1315DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Weichardo de Pollheim
Archbishop Weichardo de Pollheim (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 432
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast