Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement II

Suitgar von Morsleben

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1005²Born
8 Sep 104035.6AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Dec 104035.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 Dec 104641.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Dec 104641.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Oct 104742.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Suitgar von Morsleben (VIAF: 233092967)
Pope Suitgar von Morsleben (born 1005, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHornburg

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
  • a pope for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,048
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,724
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast