Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bardo de Oppershofen

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
980¹Born
21 Jun 103151.4AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
29 Jun 103151.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
10 Jun 1051³71.4DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bardo de Oppershofen
Archbishop Bardo de Oppershofen (born 980, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOppershofen
Ordained BishopGoslar

  • a bishop for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast