Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo II

St. Leone

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
611¹Born
680²69.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
680²69.0Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 681³70.0AppointedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
17 Aug 68271.6Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Jul 68372.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Leone (VIAF: 10203519)
Pope St. Leone (born 611, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAidone
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2+: ATh, 13 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast