Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Nicholas V

Tommaso Parentucelli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1397BornSarzana
1422²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 144447.0AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
16 Dec 144649.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 144649.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
6 Mar 144749.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
17 Mar 144749.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Mar 144749.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Mar 145557.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Parentucelli:
Pope Tommaso Parentucelli (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,879
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1446

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014