Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nikolaus Cardinal von Cusa

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
1436²36.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 144848.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144949.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
23 Mar 145050.2AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Apr 145050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Aug 146464.6DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Cusa (VIAF: 89623095)
Nikolaus Cardinal von Cusa (born 1400, died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCues, Germany

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1448
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,589
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017