Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XIII

Ugo Boncompagni

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1502Born
20 Jul 155856.5AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
20 Oct 156058.7ResignedBishop of Vieste, Italy
12 Mar 156563.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156563.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
13 May 157270.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 May 157270.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Apr 158583.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ugo Boncompagni (VIAF: 49209402)
Pope Ugo Boncompagni (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 7.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 12.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 332
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 22*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018