Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Rojas de Portalrubio, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1512¹BornToledo, Spain
5 Nov 157260.8AppointedBishop of Malta
9 Nov 157260.8Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
19 Mar 157765.2DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Rojas de Portalrubio:
Bishop Martín Rojas de Portalrubio O.S.Io.Hieros. (died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,391
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 83, Number 497
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015