Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Giacomo Borbone

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1540Born
17 May 157434.0AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
22 Nov 157535.5DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giacomo Borbone
Archbishop Pietro Giacomo Borbone (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,605

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast