Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory X

Bl. Tedaldo Visconti

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹BornPiacenza
1 Sep 127161.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Mar 127262.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 127262.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Jan 127666.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Jul 1713Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Tedaldo Visconti: VIAF:78778341
Pope Bl. Tedaldo Visconti (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 3.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
  • a pope for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014