Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paschal I

St. Pasquale

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
775¹Born
796²21.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
796²21.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 81742.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Jan 81742.0Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
11 Feb 82449.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Pasquale (VIAF: 41226927)
Pope St. Pasquale (born 775, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast