Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Nicholas IV

Girolamo Masci, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1227BornLisciano
20 May 127446.6AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
12 Mar 127850.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
12 Mar 127850.4Elevated to Cardinal
May 1279³51.5ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
12 Apr 128153.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
22 Feb 128860.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Feb 128860.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Apr 129264.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Masci:
Pope Girolamo Masci O.F.M. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 9.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014