Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent VII

Cosmato Gentile de’ Migliorati

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1336BornSulmona
4 Nov 138751.8AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
5 Dec 138751.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
19 Jun 138953.5AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Dec 138954.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 138954.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
15 Sep 140064.7ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
17 Oct 140468.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
11 Nov 140468.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Nov 140670.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Cosmato Gentile de’ Migliorati:
Holy Father Cosmato Gentile de’ Migliorati (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013