Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Bromfeld

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jun 1389Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
9 Aug 1389AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
10 Jun 1393DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Bromfeld:
Bishop Edmund Bromfeld (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 292
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 247
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013