Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory IV

Gregorio , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
790¹Born
797²7.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
797²7.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 82737.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Mar 82838.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Jan 84454.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (VIAF: 231834862)
Pope Gregorio O.S.B. (born 790, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
  • a cardinal for 30.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast