Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Zacharias

St. Zaccaria

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
679¹Born
12 Apr 73253.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon
12 Apr 73253.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 74162.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Dec 74162.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 74162.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
15 Mar 752³73.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for St. Zaccaria (VIAF: 268783427)
Pope St. Zaccaria (born 679, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Severino
Ordained BishopS. Lorenzo Oratory, Lateran patriarchium, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 10.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast