Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander III

Rolando Bandinelli, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1100¹Born
Oct 1150³50.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
Oct 1150³50.7Elevated to Cardinal
1151²51.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
7 Sep 115959.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Sep 115959.7Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Aug 118181.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rolando Bandinelli
Pope Rolando Bandinelli C.R.L. (born 1100, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena
Ordained BishopNinfa

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
  • a cardinal for 8.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1150
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast