Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John XII

Ottaviano

Deceased

Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
937¹Born
944¹7.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon
944¹7.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 95518.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Dec 96326.9ResignedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 May 96427.3DiedPope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano (VIAF: 15126731)
Pope Ottaviano (born 937, died ) Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVia Lata, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCampagna

  • a cardinal for 11.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast