Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Boniface IX

Pietro Tomacelli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350BornCasaranello
21 Dec 138132.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
21 Dec 138132.0Elevated to Cardinal
May 138535.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
2 Nov 138939.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Nov 138939.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Oct 140454.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Pietro Tomacelli:
Holy Father Pietro Tomacelli (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Dec 1381
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013