Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maffiolus de Lampugnano

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateEventTitle
Oct 1385³AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
10 Jul 1387AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1390¹Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1 Mar 1392AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kraków, Poland
17 Apr 1393AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Płock, Poland
27 Jul 1396DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maffiolus de Lampugnano:
Archbishop Maffiolus de Lampugnano (died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 403, and Page 411
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 214, and Page 337
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013