Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Moricotti Prignani Butillo

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1362AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
18 Sep 1378Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 1378InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
1379¹ResignedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
Jul 1380AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
6 Feb 1394DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Moricotti Prignani Butillo
Francesco Cardinal Moricotti Prignani Butillo (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVico
Death PlaceAssisi, Diocese of Assisi, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Pisa, Archdiocese of Pisa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast