Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Nicholas III

Giovanni Gaetano Orsini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹Born
28 May 124434.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
28 May 124434.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Oct 127666.7AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
25 Nov 127767.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
Dec 1277³67.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Aug 128070.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gaetano Orsini
Pope Giovanni Gaetano Orsini (born 1210, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
  • a cardinal for 33.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 May 1244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Apr 2018