Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Flavacourt

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1278AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
22 May 1278Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
6 Apr 1306DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Flavacourt
Archbishop Guillaume de Flavacourt (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 425
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,724

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jun 2020

Quantcast