Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thrugot Thorstensen

Deceased

Archbishop of Lund, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1277AppointedArchbishop of Lund, Sweden
27 Dec 1277Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lund, Sweden
2 May 1280DiedArchbishop of Lund, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Thrugot Thorstensen
Archbishop Thrugot Thorstensen (died ) Archbishop of Lund

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 317
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast