Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Stephen III

Stefano

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
720¹Born
76141.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
76141.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 76848.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Aug 76848.5Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Jan 77252.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Stefano (VIAF: 7742188)
Pope Stefano (born 720, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTossina Castle, Siracusa, Diocese of Siracusa
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 3.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast