Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Celestine II

Guido di Castello

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1085¹Born
Dec 1127³42.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
Dec 1127³42.9Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1133³48.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
26 Sep 114358.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Oct 114358.7Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Mar 114459.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guido di Castello
Pope Guido di Castello (born 1085, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello

  • a bishop for .4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Dec 1127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast