Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander II

Anselmo da Baggio

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1018¹Born
23 Mar 1057³39.2AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
30 Sep 106143.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Oct 106143.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Apr 107355.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo da Baggio
Pope Anselmo da Baggio (born 1018, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a pope for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast