Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo III

St. Leo

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
750¹Born
780¹30.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
780¹30.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Dec 79545.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Dec 79545.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Jun 81666.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Leo (VIAF: 120699807)
Pope St. Leo (born 750, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast