Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Hadrian VI

Adriaan Florenszoom Dedel

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1459BornUtrecht, Netherlands
30 Jun 149031.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 151657.5AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1 Jul 151758.3Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151758.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
9 Jan 152262.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
31 Aug 152263.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Sep 152364.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Adriaan Florenszoom Dedel:
Pope Adriaan Florenszoom Dedel (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,808
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 31, Number 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014