Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Hadrian II

Adriano

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
792¹BornRoma
842²50.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
842²50.0Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 86775.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Dec 86775.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Dec 87280.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adriano
Pope Adriano (born 792, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 842
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,704
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Feb 2016