Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Victor III

Desiderio , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1026¹Born
19 Apr 105832.2AppointedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
6 Mar 105933.1Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 105933.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
14 Mar 105933.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
24 May 108660.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 May 108761.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Sep 108761.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Desiderio
Pope Desiderio O.S.B. (born 1026, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento

  • a bishop for .3 years
  • a cardinal for 27.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Mar 1059

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast