Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory VII

Ildebrando , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1020¹Born
6 Mar 105939.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
6 Mar 105939.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Apr 107353.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Jun 107353.4Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 May 108565.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildebrando
Pope Ildebrando O.S.B. (born 1020, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoana
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 12.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Mar 1059
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 May 2020

Quantcast