Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo IV

St. Leo

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
790¹Born
844²54.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
844²54.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 84757.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Apr 84757.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
17 Jul 85565.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Leo (VIAF: 251109897)
Pope St. Leo (born 790, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast