Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement III

Paolo Scolari

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1130¹Born
Mar 1179³49.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Sergio e Bacco
Mar 1179³49.1Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1180³50.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
19 Dec 118757.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Jan 118858.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Mar 119161.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Scolari (VIAF: 311112171)
Pope Paolo Scolari (born 1130, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 8.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 3.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Mar 1179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jul 2017