Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict V

Benedict

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
915¹Born
22 May 96449.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Jun 96449.4ResignedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Jul 96651.5DiedPope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedict (VIAF: 24956642)
Pope Benedict (born 915, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceHamburg, Archdiocese of Hamburg, Germany

  • a pope for 2.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast