Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander IV

Rinaldo Conti di Segni

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1185¹BornJenne, Italy
18 Sep 122742.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
18 Sep 122742.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 123247.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
Mar 1235³50.2Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
12 Dec 125469.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Dec 125470.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 May 126176.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Conti di Segni:
Holy Father Rinaldo Conti di Segni (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 6.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014