Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent IV

Sinibaldo Fieschi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1195¹Born
1225¹30.0AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
1226¹31.0ResignedBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Sep 122732.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
18 Sep 122732.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 124348.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Jun 124348.4Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Dec 125459.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sinibaldo Fieschi
Pope Sinibaldo Fieschi (born 1195, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManarola

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1227
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast