Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Bilversheim, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jun 1242SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
1 Oct 1245Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Oct 1245ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Oct 1247AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chiemsee, Germany
1252²ResignedApostolic Administrator of Chiemsee, Germany
17 Sep 1257DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Bilversheim (VIAF: 20478448)
Bishop Heinrich von Bilversheim O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France
Death PlaceWolfsberg

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 126, and Page 184
  • ob/c2: ATh, 26 Nov 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,872
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast