Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gutierrez Ruiz Doclea

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1246AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
6 Feb 1249AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
9 Aug 1250DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gutierrez Ruiz Doclea
Archbishop Gutierrez Ruiz Doclea (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 208, and Page 487
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,095
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 296, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018