Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo VIII

Leo

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
915¹Born
4 Dec 96348.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Dec 96348.9Ordained BishopBishop
23 Jun 96449.4AppointedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Mar 96550.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Leo (VIAF: 73382646)
Pope Leo (born 915, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
  • a pope for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast