Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Stephen IX (X)

Frédéric de Lorraine, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1020¹Born
1049²29.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
1049²29.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 May 105737.3AppointedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
14 Jun 105737.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
2 Aug 105737.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Aug 105737.5Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Mar 105838.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frédéric de Lorraine (VIAF: 8183963)
Pope Frédéric de Lorraine O.S.B. (born 1020, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorraine
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1049
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast