Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Non-Voting Cardinals


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
BirthdateAgeElevatedNameCurrent Title
14 Sep 1921 5 Mar 1973Paulo Evaristo Cardinal Arns, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Săo Paulo, Brazil
21 Nov 1926 24 May 1976William Wakefield Cardinal BaumMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Sep 1922 30 Jun 1979Roger Marie Élie Cardinal EtchegarayPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
20 May 1927 30 Jun 1979Franciszek Cardinal MacharskiArchbishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
4 Jun 1933 2 Feb 1983Godfried Cardinal DanneelsArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
1 Mar 1925 2 Feb 1983Alexandre Cardinal do NascimentoArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola
25 Jan 1929 2 Feb 1983Michael Michai Cardinal KitbunchuArchbishop Emeritus of Bangkok, Thailand
25 Dec 1933 2 Feb 1983Joachim Cardinal MeisnerArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Mar 1930 2 Feb 1983Thomas Stafford Cardinal WilliamsArchbishop Emeritus of Wellington, New Zealand
1 Nov 1932 25 May 1985Francis Cardinal ArinzePrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
13 Jun 1928 25 May 1985Giacomo Cardinal BiffiArchbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy
17 Oct 1923 25 May 1985Henryk Roman Cardinal GulbinowiczArchbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
4 Nov 1931 25 May 1985Bernard Francis Cardinal LawArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
2 Feb 1926 25 May 1985Miguel Cardinal Obando Bravo, S.D.B.Archbishop Emeritus of Managua, Nicaragua
21 Feb 1924 25 May 1985Silvano Cardinal PiovanelliArchbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
30 Aug 1930 25 May 1985Paul Joseph Jean Cardinal PoupardPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture
26 Nov 1931 25 May 1985Adrianus Johannes Cardinal SimonisArchbishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands
11 Mar 1924 25 May 1985Jozef Cardinal TomkoPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
6 Feb 1931 25 May 1985Ricardo Jamin Cardinal VidalArchbishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines
20 Feb 1928 25 May 1985Friedrich Cardinal WetterArchbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
30 Sep 1918 28 Jun 1988Giovanni Cardinal CanestriArchbishop Emeritus of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
23 Oct 1925 28 Jun 1988José Cardinal Freire FalcăoArchbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
31 Mar 1927 28 Jun 1988Eduardo Cardinal Martínez SomaloChamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber
8 May 1927 28 Jun 1988László Cardinal Paskai, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
18 Mar 1924 28 Jun 1988Alexandre José Maria Cardinal dos Santos, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Maputo, Mozambique
25 Oct 1923 28 Jun 1988Achille Cardinal SilvestriniPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
15 Oct 1930 28 Jun 1988Christian Wiyghan Cardinal TumiArchbishop Emeritus of Douala, Cameroon
5 Jul 1924 28 Jun 1991Edward Idris Cardinal CassidyPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
22 Jan 1924 28 Jun 1991Ján Chryzostom Cardinal Korec, S.J.Bishop Emeritus of Nitra, Slovakia
19 Feb 1931 28 Jun 1991Camillo Cardinal RuiniVicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Jun 1932 28 Jun 1991Henri Cardinal SchweryBishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
23 Nov 1927 28 Jun 1991Angelo Cardinal SodanoSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State
26 Jul 1922 26 Nov 1994Gilberto Cardinal AgustoniPrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura
2 Dec 1921 26 Nov 1994Carlo Cardinal FurnoGrand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
4 Mar 1931 26 Nov 1994William Henry Cardinal KeelerArchbishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
18 Mar 1930 26 Nov 1994Adam Joseph Cardinal MaidaArchbishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Mar 1933 26 Nov 1994Juan Cardinal Sandoval ÍńiguezArchbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 May 1920 26 Nov 1994Nasrallah Pierre Cardinal SfeirPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
17 May 1932 26 Nov 1994Miloslav Cardinal VlkArchbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Dec 1926 26 Nov 1994Emmanuel Cardinal WamalaArchbishop Emeritus of Kampala, Uganda
4 Jul 1929 21 Feb 1998Darío Cardinal Castrillón HoyosPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
6 Sep 1930 21 Feb 1998Salvatore Cardinal De GiorgiArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy
13 Aug 1924 21 Feb 1998Serafim Cardinal Fernandes de AraújoArchbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Aug 1926 21 Feb 1998Marian Cardinal JaworskiArchbishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine
23 Dec 1926 21 Feb 1998Jorge Arturo Augustin Cardinal Medina EstévezPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
14 Nov 1930 21 Feb 1998Jānis Cardinal PujatsArchbishop Emeritus of Riga, Latvia
26 Jul 1932 21 Feb 1998James Francis Cardinal StaffordMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary
14 Mar 1934 21 Feb 1998Dionigi Cardinal TettamanziArchbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy
19 Oct 1933 21 Feb 2001Geraldo Majella Cardinal AgneloArchbishop Emeritus of Săo Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
14 Jul 1925 21 Feb 2001Francisco Cardinal Alvarez MartínezArchbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain
14 Aug 1926 21 Feb 2001Agostino Cardinal CacciavillanPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
24 Mar 1926 21 Feb 2001Desmond Cardinal ConnellArchbishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland
2 Apr 1932 21 Feb 2001Edward Michael Cardinal EganArchbishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA
5 Sep 1933 21 Feb 2001Francisco Javier Cardinal Errázuriz Ossa, P. SchönstattArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile
8 Aug 1934 21 Feb 2001Cláudio Aury Affonso Cardinal Hummes, O.F.M.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy
26 Feb 1933 21 Feb 2001Lubomyr Cardinal Husar, M.S.U.Major Archbishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Aug 1926 21 Feb 2001Marian Cardinal JaworskiArchbishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine
5 Mar 1933 21 Feb 2001Walter Cardinal KasperPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
7 Jul 1930 21 Feb 2001Theodore Edgar Cardinal McCarrickArchbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
31 Jan 1923 21 Feb 2001Jorge María Cardinal MejíaArchivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives
24 Aug 1932 21 Feb 2001Cormac Cardinal Murphy-O’ConnorArchbishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 1933 21 Feb 2001Severino Cardinal PolettoArchbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Nov 1930 21 Feb 2001Jānis Cardinal PujatsArchbishop Emeritus of Riga, Latvia
30 Jan 1934 21 Feb 2001Giovanni Battista Cardinal RePrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Bishops
13 Sep 1932 21 Feb 2001Pedro Cardinal Rubiano SŕenzArchbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia
6 Jan 1932 21 Feb 2001José Cardinal Saraiva Martins, C.M.F.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
11 Apr 1931 21 Feb 2001Sergio Cardinal SebastianiPresident Emeritus of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
19 Apr 1921 21 Feb 2001Roberto Cardinal Tucci, S.J.Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio
23 Aug 1934 21 Oct 2003Carlos Cardinal Amigo Vallejo, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
25 Apr 1922 21 Oct 2003Georges Marie Martin Cardinal Cottier, O.P.Cardinal-Priest of Santi Domenico e Sisto
31 Mar 1930 21 Oct 2003Julián Cardinal Herranz CasadoPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
26 Jan 1933 21 Oct 2003Javier Cardinal Lozano BarragánPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
23 Nov 1932 21 Oct 2003Renato Raffaele Cardinal MartinoPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
26 Jan 1931 21 Oct 2003Bernard Louis Auguste Paul Cardinal PanafieuArchbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France
5 Mar 1934 21 Oct 2003Jean-Baptiste Cardinal Pham Minh MânArchbishop Emeritus of Thŕnh-Phô Hô Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
8 Dec 1932 21 Oct 2003Eusébio Oscar Cardinal Scheid, S.C.I.Archbishop Emeritus of Săo Sebastiăo do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Dec 1931 24 Mar 2006Nicholas Cardinal Cheong Jin-SukArchbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)
27 Aug 1925 24 Mar 2006Andrea Cardinal Cordero Lanza di MontezemoloArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
23 Sep 1934 24 Mar 2006Franc Cardinal Rodé, C.M.Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
10 Aug 1932 24 Mar 2006Gaudencio Borbon Cardinal RosalesArchbishop Emeritus of Manila, Philippines
23 Jul 1923 24 Mar 2006Albert Cardinal Vanhoye, S.J.Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani
13 Jan 1932 24 Mar 2006Joseph Cardinal Zen Ze-kiun, S.D.B.Bishop Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
9 Nov 1925 24 Nov 2007Giovanni Cardinal CoppaApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Czech Republic
5 Sep 1934 24 Nov 2007Paul Josef Cardinal CordesPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
24 Sep 1933 24 Nov 2007Raffaele Cardinal Farina, S.D.B.Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives
7 Feb 1926 24 Nov 2007Estanislao Esteban Cardinal KarlicArchbishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina
5 Jan 1929 20 Nov 2010Walter Cardinal BrandmüllerPresident Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other
1 Jan 1926 20 Nov 2010José Manuel Cardinal Estepa LlaurensArchbishop Emeritus of Spain, Military
28 May 1934 20 Nov 2010Francesco Cardinal MonterisiArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
1 Sep 1934 20 Nov 2010Paolo Cardinal SardiVice-Chamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber
6 Jun 1928 20 Nov 2010Elio Cardinal SgrecciaPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Academy for Life
1 Jan 1934 20 Nov 2010Raúl Eduardo Cardinal Vela ChiribogaArchbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador
18 Apr 1928 18 Feb 2012Karl Josef Cardinal Becker, S.J.Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuliano Martire
24 Dec 1925 18 Feb 2012Prospero (Stanley) Cardinal Grech, O.S.A.Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti
23 May 1931 18 Feb 2012Lucian Cardinal MureşanMajor Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
14 Oct 1915 22 Feb 2014Loris Francesco Cardinal CapovillaPrelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy
15 Feb 1933 22 Feb 2014Kelvin Edward Cardinal FelixArchbishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
14 Dec 1929 22 Feb 2014Fernando Cardinal Sebastián Aguilar, C.M.F.Archbishop Emeritus of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
Note: 96 non-voting Cardinals of 209 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 26 Nov 2014.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 26 Nov 2014