Ordained Bishop | Years | Name | Current Title |
21 Jun 2024 |
| Father Luisito Audal Occiano | Bishop-Elect of Virac, Philippines |
9 Jun 2024 |
| Father Aurelio Gazzera, O.C.D. | Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Bangassou, Central African Republic |
8 Jun 2024 |
| Father Michel Jalakh, O.A.M. | Secretary of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches, Roman Curia |
2 Jun 2024 |
| Father Grégoire Drouot | Bishop-Elect of Nevers, France |
1 Jun 2024 |
| Father Mirko Štefković | Bishop-Elect of Zrenjanin, Serbia |
11 May 2024 |
| Father Adenis Roberto de Oliveira, S.d.P. | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil |
11 May 2024 |
| Monsignor Mauro Lalli | Apostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea |
11 May 2024 |
| Father Edmar José da Silva | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil |
9 May 2024 |
| Father Hironimus Pakaenoni | Archbishop-Elect of Kupang, Indonesia |
7 May 2024 |
| Father James Thomas Ruggieri | Bishop-Elect of Portland, Maine, USA |
4 May 2024 |
| Father Flavio Pace | Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity, Roman Curia |
4 May 2024 |
| Father Gabriel Blamo Snosio Jubwe | Archbishop-Elect of Monrovia, Liberia |
4 May 2024 |
| Father Davide Carbonaro, O.M.D. | Archbishop-Elect of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy |
30 Apr 2024 |
| Father Karnam Dhaman Kumar, M.S.F.S. | Bishop-Elect of Nalgonda, India |
27 Apr 2024 |
| Father Luis Enrique Saldaña Guerra, O.F.M. | Bishop-Elect of David, Panama |
27 Apr 2024 |
| Father Reynaldo Bunyi Getalado, M.S.P. | Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania) |
27 Apr 2024 |
| Father Martin James Chambers | Bishop-Elect of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain |
21 Apr 2024 |
| Abbot Octavi Vilà Mayo, O. Cist. | Bishop-Elect of Girona, Spain |
21 Apr 2024 |
| Father Edilson de Souza Silva | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Paulo, Brazil |
20 Apr 2024 |
| Father Giordano Piccinotti, S.D.B. | President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See, Roman Curia |
20 Apr 2024 |
| Ángel Cardinal Fernández Artime, S.D.B. | Rector Major of Salesians of Saint John Bosco |
20 Apr 2024 |
| Father Domenico Beneventi | Bishop-Elect of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy |
14 Apr 2024 |
| Father Jean Désiré Razafinirina | Bishop-Elect of Morombe, Madagascar |
14 Apr 2024 |
| Father Victor Ndione | Bishop-Elect of Nouakchott, Mauritania |
11 Apr 2024 |
| Father Paul Kyung Sang Lee | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Seoul, Korea (South) |
9 Apr 2024 |
| Father Prakash Sagili | Bishop-Elect of Khammam, India |
9 Apr 2024 |
| Father Duming Dias | Bishop-Elect of Karwar, India |
8 Apr 2024 |
| Father Valan Arasu | Bishop-Elect of Jabalpur, India |
7 Apr 2024 |
| Father Bernard Lancy Pinto | Bishop-Elect of Aurangabad, India |
7 Apr 2024 |
| Father Eugênio Barbosa Martins, S.S.S. | Bishop-Elect of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil |
6 Apr 2024 |
| Monsignor Janusz Stanisław Urbańczyk | Apostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe |
6 Apr 2024 |
| Father Wallace Ng’ang’a Gachihi | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nairobi, Kenya |
6 Apr 2024 |
| Father Danival Milagres Coelho | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil |
6 Apr 2024 |
| Father Simon Peter Kamomoe | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nairobi, Kenya |
5 Apr 2024 |
| Father Thomas Mathew Kuttimackal | Bishop-Elect of Indore, India |
23 Mar 2024 |
| Father Paul Tawat Singsa | Bishop-Elect of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand |
20 Mar 2024 |
| Father Thomas Ifeanyichukwu Obiatuegwu | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Orlu, Nigeria |
19 Mar 2024 |
| Father Vincent Cosmas Mwagala | Bishop-Elect of Mafinga, Tanzania |
19 Mar 2024 |
| Father Michel Moura | Vicar Apostolic of Rodrigues, Mauritius |
18 Mar 2024 |
| Father Napoleon Balili Sipalay, Jr., O.P. | Bishop-Elect of Alaminos, Philippines |
17 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop João de Ceita Nazaré | Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe |
16 Mar 2024 |
| Father Bruno Varriano, O.F.M. | Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine |
10 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Désiré Lenge Mukwenye | Bishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
10 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop François Hervé Marie Durand | Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France |
9 Mar 2024 |
| Archbishop Vincenzo Turturro | Apostolic Nuncio to Paraguay |
9 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Matthieu Henri Fabien Dupont | Bishop of Laval, France |
9 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Francis McAnally Dougan | Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain |
7 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Efren Veridiano Esmilla | Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA |
7 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Christopher Randall Cooke | Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA |
7 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Keith James Chylinski | Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA |
3 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Bhaskar Jesuraj | Bishop of Meerut, India |
2 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Roberto Carlos Zacarías López | Bishop of Canindeyú, Paraguay |
2 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Stanislav Přibyl, C.Ss.R. | Bishop of Litoměřice, Czechia |
2 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Željko Majić | Bishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina |
2 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Juan Ignacio Liébana | Bishop of Chascomús, Argentina |
2 Mar 2024 |
| Bishop Arachchige Don Wimal Siri Appuhamy Jayasuriya | Bishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka |
24 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Stephen Boonlert Phromsena | Bishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand |
24 Feb 2024 |
| Archbishop Abel Liluala | Archbishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo |
22 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Juan Carlos Londoño | Auxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada |
22 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Albert George Alexander Anastas | Bishop of Kuzhithurai, India |
15 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Mathews Pachomius Kadavil, O.I.C. | Bishop of Saint Ephrem of Khadki (Syro-Malankara), India |
12 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Justin Alexander Madathiparambil | Auxiliary Bishop of Vijayapuram, India |
11 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Teshome Fikre Woldetensae | Coadjutor Bishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
11 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Jeevanandam Amalanathan | Bishop of Kumbakonam, India |
10 Feb 2024 |
| Archbishop Giovanni Cesare Pagazzi | Secretary of the Dicastery for Culture and Education, Roman Curia |
10 Feb 2024 |
| Archbishop Biagio Colaianni | Archbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy |
4 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Raimundo Vanthuy Neto, Ist. del Prado | Bishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil |
3 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Cristiano Guilherme Borro Barbosa | Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA |
2 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Joaquim Hudson de Souza Ribeiro | Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil |
2 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Anselm Pendo Lawani | Bishop of Ilorin, Nigeria |
2 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Léonard Kakudji Muzinga | Bishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
2 Feb 2024 |
| Bishop Alcivan Tadeus Gomes de Araújo | Auxiliary Bishop of Paraíba, Brazil |
1 Feb 2024 |
| Archbishop Fransiskus Nipa | Coadjutor Archbishop of Makassar, Indonesia |
31 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Peter Wu Yishun | Bishop of Shaowu [Shaowu], China |
29 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Antonio Sun Wenjun | Bishop of Weifang, China |
28 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Luc Olivier Razafitsimialona | Bishop of Tôlagnaro, Madagascar |
28 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Osório Citora Afonso, I.M.C. | Auxiliary Bishop of Maputo, Mozambique |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Archbishop Florencio Roselló Avellanas, O. de M. | Archbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Jovitus Francis Mwijage | Bishop of Bukoba, Tanzania |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Archbishop Jonáš (Jozef) Maxim, M.S.U. | Archbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak), Slovakia |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Peter Rumal Kharadi | Bishop of Jhabua, India |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Geraldo de Souza Rodrigues | Bishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil |
27 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Joaquim Carlos Carvalho, O.S.B. | Bishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil |
26 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Davide Carraro, P.I.M.E. | Bishop of Oran, Algeria |
25 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Taddeo Wang Yuesheng | Bishop of Zhengzhou [Chengchow], China |
25 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Malcolm Sequeira | Bishop of Amravati, India |
25 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Michel Proulx, O. Praem. | Bishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick |
21 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Giuseppe Russo | Bishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy |
20 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Michael Smolinski, C.Ss.R. | Bishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada |
20 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Ambrose Puthenveettil | Bishop of Kottapuram, India |
20 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Vincent Frederick Mwakhwawa | Auxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi |
20 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Mikel Garciandía Goñi | Bishop of Palencia, Spain |
14 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Eusebio Samwel Kyando | Bishop of Njombe, Tanzania |
13 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Óscar Álvarez Orellana | Auxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador |
12 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Linus Pingal Ekka | Bishop of Gumla, India |
4 Jan 2024 |
| Bishop Francisco Javier Martínez Castillo | Auxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, México |
19 Dec 2023 |
| Bishop Simeon Okezuo Nwobi, C.M.F. | Auxiliary Bishop of Ahiara, Nigeria |
16 Dec 2023 |
| Bishop Libère Pwongo Bope | Bishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
16 Dec 2023 |
| Bishop Andrea Lembo, P.I.M.E. | Auxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan |
16 Dec 2023 |
| Bishop Paulo Renato Fernandes Gonçalves de Campos | Bishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil |