Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana

Dioecesis Faventina-Mutilensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mario Toso, S.D.B., Bishop
  • Claudio Stagni, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bologna
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,044 (403 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Emilia-Romagna
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesifaenza.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza XI Febbraio 10, 48018 Faenza [Ravenna], Italia
  • Telephone: 0546.21.642
  • Fax: 0546.69.30.63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Faenza
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Faenza (erected)
7 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Faenza Diocese of Modigliana (erected)
16 November 1940Territory AddedDiocese of Imola (S. Petronius in Castelbolognese) Diocese of Faenza
16 November 1940Territory LostDiocese of Faenza (Bianeanigo) Diocese of Imola
7 October 1972Territory AddedDiocese of Modigliana (San Giacomo in Converselle and Santa Maria in Ciola or Zola (in Brisighella)) Diocese of Faenza
Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Faenza
Diocese of Modigliana
Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Faenza
188693,977.0%3840114OTC
1950124,000125,00099.2%2314928044269448118ap1951
1970127,000128,00099.2%1765523154962450123ap1971
1980132,500135,00098.1%1583219069737320124ap1981
Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana
1990119,610123,27597.0%163271906293425189ap1991
1999118,600122,01897.2%141251667143424989ap2000
2000116,127120,20796.6%132211537593021489ap2001
2001116,000121,00095.9%1271914679432519789ap2002
2002116,000121,00095.9%1241814281632517489ap2003
2003116,000121,00095.9%127713486531220788ap2004
2004116,000121,00095.9%121712890631220588ap2005
2006113,000126,03489.7%111711895751222388ap2007
2013132,259140,82193.9%8210921,437111414188ap2014
2016134,652143,40093.9%659741,819141213288ap2017
2019132,900141,50093.9%629711,871151012387ap2020
2021131,730140,27093.9%579661,995151011386ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Faenza
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 245, and Page 246
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 152
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198, and Page 199
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 688, to Page 689
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 33, Page 122, and Page 123
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 786, and Page 787
  • Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 704, to Page 707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 16 Jun 2024